+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1015)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1107ER2)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1015 (effective 7/1/03)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (92-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Title amended by Governor's recommendation
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1107ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 035139211-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 035139211-H1
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (20-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 035139211-H1
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Sen. Whipple agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Printed as reengrossed 035074211-E2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 035074211-E
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 3
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 035074211
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2003: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (20-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor