+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 15104394D-S2 (Miller)
- Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute rejected 15104089D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1105S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N)
- Substitute by Senator Miller agreed to 15104394D-S2
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1105S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104089D-S1
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104089D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103554D
+ − Votes (13)
February 18, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N)
January 28, 2015: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N)
January 28, 2015: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
January 27, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
January 27, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor