+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103042D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1105ES1
- Printed as engrossed 21103042D-ES1
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21103042D-S1
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100837D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor