+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1104ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11102816D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1104E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102816D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor