+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1104S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106004D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106004D-S1
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101619D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor