+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Tra. (9-Y 16-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Couric agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 996604633-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 996604633