+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1102S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103253D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103253D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101111D