+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 079456216-H2 (Wardrup)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 079453848-H1
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1101S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 079382848-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 079382848-S1
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 079336848
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor