+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective - see bill)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB11ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Rust, Jones, Howell, A.T.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Puller, Martin, Petersen
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105082D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB11H1
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105082D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB11S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104034D-S1
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB181
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104034D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On December 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100188D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 8, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
March 4, 2014: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
February 27, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor