+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100468D