+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1096ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #1
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11101867D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1096E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101867D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2011: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor