+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0878)
On March 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 878 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1096ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rec. of House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- House sub. w/amd. agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
- Passed House with sub. with amendment (89-Y 10-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd 031016420-EH1
- Amendment by Del. Orrock agreed to
- Motion to reconsider to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Hurt rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 031016420-H1
- Amendments by Del. Hamilton rejected
- Read third time
- Amendment by Del. Athey withdrawn
- Amendment by Del. Hull rejected
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 031016420-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub (21-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 035404408-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 035404408-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 035404408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 032261420
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
February 10, 2003: Reported from Finance with sub (21-Y 1-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor