+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1093ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101546D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor