+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1092ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019031220
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Tra. (24-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor