+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
On March 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1088ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 052232118-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1088E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (13-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052232118
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor