+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1088ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 19101377D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1088E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101377D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor