+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/15)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1085ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 15102861D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1085E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102861D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor