+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1083ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102379D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor