+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1082ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105456D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1082S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 23105456D-S1
- Incorporates SB1446 (Cosgrove)
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103998D