+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1082ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N)
- Passed House (78-Y 20-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 073165792-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1082E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073165792
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor