+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1080ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 972209745-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 972209745-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 972209745-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 974776745
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor