+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 107 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1077ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 038783244