+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1074ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N)
- Passed House (77-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (18-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036630522