+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1072ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (17-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 013381404-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 013381404-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 013381404-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 013351404
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (17-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor