+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1072ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 071143836-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1072E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071143836
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2007: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor