+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB107ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 2-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (34-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed