+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1067ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 999754807
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor