+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 365 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1064ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1064S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106211D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23106211D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103798D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2023: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2023: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor