+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1064ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 994470755-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 994470755
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor