+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/11)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1064ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11101472D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1064E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101472D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2011: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2011: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor