+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1063ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 17105884D-S3
- Amended by conference committee
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- Delegates: Bell, R.B., Jones, Torian
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Deeds, Hanger, Wexton
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1063H2
- Substitute by Delegate Jones agreed to 17105745D-H2
- Committee substitute rejected 17105653D-H1
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 17105745D-H2 (Jones)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105653D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 17104123D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104924D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1063S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB942 (Cosgrove)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104924D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB942 (Cosgrove)
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17104123D-S1
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102162D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
February 25, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2017: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 23, 2017: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor