+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1062ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100745D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 19, 2015: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor