+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1060ER)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 38-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House insisted on amendments
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Reynolds, Howell, Edwards
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Armstrong, Deeds, Cantor
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 970040428
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 1997: VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 38-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor