+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB106ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments (61-Y 39-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20106341D-ES1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB106ES1
- Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106341D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20106341D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N)
On December 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101022D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2020: House amendments agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
March 2, 2020: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N)
February 26, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
February 24, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
January 23, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Scott A. Surovell
Type:
Primary Sponsor