+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0242)
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 242 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1057ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, and Natural Resources (Cox)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075102129
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2007: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor