+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
On April 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1056ER2)
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- Governor's recommendation adopted in part
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation No. 2 (97-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation No. 2 (39-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation No. 1 (7-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. PT1 (7-Y 32-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation No. 3 (7-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. PT2 (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. PT3 (7-Y 32-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation No. 4 & 5 (9-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. PT4 (9-Y 30-N)
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1056ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: (59-Y 34-N)
- House receded from amendments (59-Y 34-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (10-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (10-Y 29-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N)
- Amendments by Del. Dillard agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendments (79-Y 19-N)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 014171520-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 014171520-S1
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 014171520-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 014142520