+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1056ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) by voice vote
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1056E
- Printed as engrossed 15102643D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102643D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 26, 2015: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor