+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 576 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1055ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 996310700