+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1054ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101247D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2023: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2023: Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor