+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
On March 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1054ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of House Block Vote passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999106700-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 999106700-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 999106700-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 996343811
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor