+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1054ER)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended SB1054
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1054E
- Printed as engrossed 13101313D-E
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101313D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2013: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor