+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 994557719-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law & Procedure
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 994557719