+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
On March 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1051ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD2023726-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed LD2023726
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from Local Government w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor