+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1051ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N)
- Passed House (66-Y 30-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (18-Y 5-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 019198220-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 019198220-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 019198220-S1
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019018220
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Tra. (18-Y 5-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor