+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective 12/1/13)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1049ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 6-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 6-N)
On February 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 69-N)
- Amendment #2 by Delegate Pollard rejected (27-Y 69-N)
- Amendment #1 by Delegate Pollard withdrawn
- Read third time
- Amendment #6 by Delegate Miller, J.H. agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 19-N)
- Amendments #'s 3, 4 and 5 by Delegate Miller, J.H. agreed to (78-Y 19-N)
- Amendments #'s 1 and 2 by Delegate Miller, J.H. agreed to
- Passed House with amendments (76-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Pollard agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendments (79-Y 20-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (79-Y 20-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (10-Y 29-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House insisted on amendments
- House requested conference committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Miller, J.H., Albo, McClellan
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Barker, Petersen, McWaters
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105179D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1049S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1288
- Committee substitute printed 11105179D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101450D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (14)
February 26, 2011: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 6-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 69-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (79-Y 20-N)
February 24, 2011: House amendments rejected by Senate (10-Y 29-N)
February 24, 2011: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 19-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2011: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor