+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
On March 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1049ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
- Passed House (88-Y 9-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed LD6041726
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor