+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1048ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On December 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100661D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor