+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1044ER)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1044ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 010252568-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 010252568-H1
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 010252568-H1
- Reported from L. & C. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 011704540-E
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (13-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (11-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 011704540
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from L. & C. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2001: Reported from General Laws with amds (13-Y 1-N)
January 15, 2001: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j), rerefer.by C.& L. (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor