+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0943)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 943 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1044ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (76-Y 18-N)
- Passed House (76-Y 18-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1044S2
- Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to 20107505D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 20107052D-S1
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed 20107505D-S2 (McPike)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107052D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 20104415D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2020: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 18-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeremy S. McPike
Type:
Primary Sponsor