+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Presented and ordered printed 20105429D
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Obenshain
Type:
Primary Sponsor